THE CHELLINGTON CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Chellington Centre is a residential & day use centre for groups of young people to engage in their programmes of education & development providing opportunities to build self- confidence & celebrate life. We have developed relationships with various charities, church and other youth groups as well as schools for the provision of outside the classroom activities and residential experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £3,072 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
Governance
- 02 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darius Faitakis | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Claire Heseltine | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Tuohy | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chapman | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Charles Chamberlayne | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Charles Tusting | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY LESITER | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.40k | £265.41k | £157.38k | £139.08k | £269.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.36k | £101.46k | £114.95k | £149.51k | £167.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.40k | £27.53k | £2.67k | N/A | £3.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 NOV 2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. · TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chellington Centre
St. Nicholas Church
Felmersham Road
Carlton
BEDFORD
MK43 7NA
- Phone:
- 01234720726
- Email:
- admin@chellington.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window