Trustees THE CHELLINGTON CENTRE

Charity Number: 1156511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Darius Faitakis Trustee 24 January 2025
None on record
Felicity Claire Heseltine Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Matthew Tuohy Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Helen Chapman Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
Edward Charles Chamberlayne Trustee 17 June 2022
None on record
James Charles Tusting Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
RACHEL MARY LESITER Trustee 09 January 2014
None on record