ST MARTIN'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1155711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

At St Martin's Pre-School, Epsom we aim to provide a happy, friendly, enjoyable and secure environment for children of different backgrounds and abilities. Their welfare, development and all round well-being are our main priorities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £228,235
Total expenditure: £203,604

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 2014: CIO registration
  • 19 February 2015: Funds received from 1023678 ST MARTINS PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ST MARTIN'S PRE-SCHOOL CIO (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Jones Trustee 06 February 2025
None on record
Katherine Wilkinson Trustee 06 February 2025
None on record
Jennifer Hopkins Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Kristy Bond Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Hayley Priscilla Simms Trustee 11 November 2021
ST. MARTIN'S SCHOOL (EPSOM) PARENT TEACHER & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Nicholas James Speirs Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
HENRIETTA KNELL Trustee 20 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £162.76k £158.01k £211.89k £205.58k £228.24k
Total expenditure £159.82k £142.26k £185.19k £226.77k £203.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O ST MARTIN'S PRE-SCHOOL
ST MARTIN'S CHILDREN'S CENTRE
WORPLE ROAD
EPSOM
SURREY
KT18 7AA
Phone:
01372 721111