OVERSEAS CHRISTIAN ASSISTANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of funding for several church based children's feeding centres in Moldova Provision of some funds for needy situations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Moldova
- Romania
Governance
- 15 January 2014: Standard registration
- 29 July 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2018 | 01/07/2019 | 01/07/2020 | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.30k | £12.45k | £8.47k | £15.37k | £15.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.03k | £7.54k | £7.56k | £11.76k | £12.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 DEC 2012
Charitable objects
1 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OUTSIDE THE UK BY PROVIDING FINANCE,ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window