ST GREGORIOS INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church provides a place for people to worship.It focus on the development of faith through sharing of scripture,prayer and testimony.It organises holy mass on Sunday,prayer meetings and sunday school services for children.During Christmas,it arranges Christmas carol service and cultural programmes.It also arranges talent competitions and vacation bible classes for children during summer holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 31 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIBINI MUKALUVILAYIL MATHEWS | Chair | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anumol Jose | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Basil Peter | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suresh Sundaram | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sunimol Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
SIJO M JACOB | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEENA KURIAKOSE | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
RINU RAJU | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Abraham Philipose | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
K S Abraham | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Panamthottil Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.40k | £9.19k | £16.71k | £28.15k | £29.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.52k | £3.43k | £15.71k | £18.21k | £23.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 April 2022 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 April 2022 | 434 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING SHALL BE THE OBJECTS OF THE PARISH: TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT ESSEX AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS AND PUBLIC WORSHIP, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TEACHING THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Hobleythick Lane
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
SS0 0RH
- Phone:
- 07983656386
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window