Accounts and annual returns THE T L DALLAS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1156019
Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 10 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 10 March 2023 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 29 September 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 29 September 2021 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 29 September 2021 394 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required