THE T L DALLAS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make such grants and donations to such registered charities or organisations for such purposes as are considered charitable according to the laws of England and Wales as the trustees shall think fit, in particular but not exclusively for charities with aims to relieve or raise awareness of mental or physical ill health and which benefit young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bradford City
Governance
- 05 March 2014: Standard registration
- 09 April 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 April 2018: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MACKENZIE JOHN WILLIAM DALLAS | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN WILLIAM HOLLOWOOD | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
POLLY ELEANOR OLIVIA STAVELEY | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PETER MARTIN | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.81k | £18.65k | £31.32k | £12.12k | £9.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.75k | £19.51k | £42.51k | £10.03k | £6.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 March 2023 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 September 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 September 2021 | 394 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO MAKE SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CONSIDERED CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHARITIES WITH AIMS TO RELIEVE OR RAISE AWARENESS OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILL HEALTH AND WHICH BENEFIT YOUNG PEOPLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
T L Dallas & Co Ltd, Dallas House
146 Cleckheaton Road
Low Moor
BRADFORD
BD12 0HF
- Phone:
- 01274465500
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window