Financial history THE ETHAN MAULL "UP YOURS TO CANCER" FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1155905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.29k £624 £1.54k £1.54k £300
Total expenditure £1.32k £466 £0 £0 £72
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A