PORRIDGE AND RICE (UJI NA MCHELE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PaR supports 4 community schools in the Nairobi slums, Kenya with a feeding program. In addition, it assist with teacher development, facilities maintenance, and health education in community schools where we have established feeding programs already. PaR also supports orphans in Ternopil, Ukraine for the care, education and entertainment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kenya
- Ukraine
Governance
- 18 February 2014: CIO registration
- UNM (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Grant Alfred Surridge | Chair | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Hanlon | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR Vishvas Arora | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brigitte Rose Pickersgill | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.86k | £74.15k | £36.25k | £31.09k | £23.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.35k | £73.12k | £29.61k | £27.97k | £18.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 August 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 August 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 August 2022 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 August 2022 | 370 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2022 | 732 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2022 | 732 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (THE 'OBJECTS') FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN KENYA, AFRICA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING AND ASSISTING WITH THE BUILDING, MANAGEMENT AND RUNNING OF COMMUNITY AND OTHER SIMILAR SCHOOLS. (B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN KENYA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SERVICES AND TREATMENT, NUTRITION AND NUTRITION SERVICES AND ACCESS TO ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN ACCESSING SUCH MEDICAL AND NUTRITIONAL SERVICES. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS, IN PARTICULAR KENYA, AFRICA. (D) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THE PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES LIVING IN KENYA, AFRICA AND SUCH OTHER LOCATIONS IN KENYA BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, ADVICE AND MICRO FINANCE ENABLING THEM TO ESTABLISH AND GROW THEIR OWN BUSINESSES.MICRO FINANCE INCLUDES LOANS AND/OR EQUITY FUNDING FOR SMALL ENTERPRISES AND/OR THEIR PROPRIETORS, AS APPROPRIATE FOR THE INDIVIDUALS AND FIRMS SEEKING ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 Rydal Gardens
Whitton
Hounslow
TW3 2JH
- Phone:
- 07905833405
- Email:
- info@porridgeandrice.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window