ROBERTSON MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE FLEETWOOD HIGH SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 June 1975: Standard registration
- FLEETWOOD SPORTS COLLEGE (Working name)
- ROBERTSON MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND ADMINISTERED IN CONNEXION WITH THE FLEETWOOD GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FLEETWOOD HIGH SCHOOL | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2023 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1975
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE FLEETWOOD GRAMMAR SCHOOL, PREFERABLY THOSE WHOSE FATHERS ARE ENGAGED IN THE LOCAL FISHING INDUSTRY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROADWAY
FLEETWOOD
LANCS
FY7 8HE
- Phone:
- 01253876757
- Email:
- enquiries@fleetwoodhs.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window