WHARFEDALE GENERAL HOSPITAL CARDIAC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing professionally supervised exercise classes aimed at preserving, improving and protecting the health of former coronary care and heart surgery patients and those at risk of cardiac events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 February 2014: CIO registration
- WGHCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Farrow | Chair | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ben Jordan | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Davies | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Hammond | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.10k | £3.87k | £7.78k | £13.64k | £13.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.24k | £4.46k | £8.71k | £9.46k | £11.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 Feb 2014 as amended on 21 Apr 2021 as amended on 23 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are to preserve and protect the health of former coronary care and heart surgery patients and others wishing to exercise for preventative reasons by offering an exercise regime through the provision of qualified instructors, developing knowledge and social contact with similar patients.
Contact information
- Address:
-
410 Otley Road
LEEDS
LS16 8AD
- Phone:
- 07818024059
- Email:
- wghcardiacclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window