THE SQUIRREL'S NEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Craft and create objects made from wood, Sell items made, Socialise meet and support each other, Have guest visitors and hold awareness/information sessions, Promote wellbeing and health, Teach and learn new skills, Cook meals, The Squirrels Nest is open to all and the majority of members are from Bridgend and surrounding counties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
- Bridgend
- Caerphilly
- City Of Swansea
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Neath Port Talbot
- Newport City
- Pembrokeshire
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 26 February 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN EDWARD ROACH | Chair | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Card | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Tucker | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Barnett | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DON THOMAS | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK VINCENT | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.73k | £16.82k | £4.62k | £34.79k | £18.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.75k | £16.81k | £12.67k | £26.81k | £14.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PERSONS RESIDING IN BRIDGEND COUNTY BOROUGH SUFFERING FROM DEPRESSION, ANXIETY, GRIEF AND OTHER MILD TO MODERATE MENTAL ILLNESS OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WOODWORK AND RECREATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 40
Tondu Enterprise Centre
Bryn Road
Bridgend
CF32 9BS
- Phone:
- 01656729625
- Email:
- SQUIRRELSNEST1MS@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window