Financial history GRIMM AND CO. LIMITED

Charity number: 1154990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £972.92k £792.54k £1.22m £1.35m £1.32m
Total expenditure £559.27k £436.96k £544.00k £580.49k £586.44k
Income from government contracts £46.36k £45.99k £18.25k £18.25k £22.75k
Income from government grants N/A £368.20k £677.68k £791.42k £667.45k
Income - Donations and legacies £296.69k £14.50k £23.56k £23.86k £11.73k
Income - Other trading activities £55.95k £46.98k £47.83k £47.62k £32.10k
Income - Charitable activities £620.28k £731.07k £1.15m £1.28m £1.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.31k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £500.05k £392.26k £495.68k £523.69k £542.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £44.70k £48.32k £56.80k £43.83k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.43k £14.07k £14.15k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £59.22k £0 £0 £0 £0