Financial history NORTH NORFOLK FIT TOGETHER

Charity number: 1155369
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.99k £10.82k £8.35k £9.89k £866
Total expenditure £10.36k £8.67k £8.72k £3.46k £28.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £3.00k £2.50k £3.25k N/A