DURNOVARIA SILVER BAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of brass band playing, through entertaining the public, and encouraging people to learn to play a brass instrument. It particularly supports bodies such as Dorchester Town Council and West Dorset District Council, for Remembrance Day commemoration and the like. A subsidiary aim is to make its Durnovaria Band Hall available to other groups, specifically in the world of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 27 March 2014: Standard registration
- 27 May 2014: Funds received from 1073095 DURNOVARIA SILVER BAND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Carter | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dylana Membury-Hawkins | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Fox | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela May Fox | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Gannaway | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Ghose | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Carter | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.47k | £11.34k | £21.83k | £16.53k | £17.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.39k | £6.08k | £16.38k | £11.86k | £12.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ‘OBJECTS’ ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING 4.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING;4.2 TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE SAID ART BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church House West
Whitchurch Canonicorum
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 6RQ
- Phone:
- 07739588192
- Email:
- NIGELCAR94@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window