Trustees DERBY SHOPMOBILITY LTD
Charity number: 1155852

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GRAHAM JOHN MASKERY | Chair | 04 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Harrison | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Claire Bass | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Teresa Parker | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Satvinder Suzie Sanghera | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WILLIAM ALLEN | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.