Financial history SCOTTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 504341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £11.47k £13.51k £3.86k £5.57k £20.13k
Total expenditure £10.83k £6.32k £6.07k £12.08k £23.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £12.50k N/A N/A £13.16k