Trustees SCOTTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 504341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Margaret Walker Chair 13 August 2021
None on record
Patricia Mirkin Trustee 06 September 2024
None on record
Evelyn Joy Hardy Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Karen Ibbeson Trustee 27 January 2023
None on record
Lee Thompson Trustee 30 August 2019
None on record
Mark Schofield Trustee 28 March 2014
None on record
LYNNE MARGARET WETHERALL Trustee 14 May 1999
None on record