STAFFORDSHIRE WOMEN'S AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of support, advice and accommodation to women and children living with, escaping or recovering from the effects of domestic and sexual violence. Support also provided to male victims of domestic and sexual abuse. Also educate, research and raise awareness on issues related to domestic and sexual violence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,623,254
Donations and legacies | £82.04k | |
Charitable activities | £1.54m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5.51k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,576,067
Raising funds | £7.79k | |
Charitable activities | £1.57m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £299,723 from 1 government contract(s) and £688,070 from 17 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.79k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.57m | |
Retained for future use | £47.19k |
People

39 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 January 2014: CIO registration
- 31 March 2015: Funds received from 505728 STAFFORDSHIRE WOMEN'S AID GROUP
- 15 November 2018: Funds received from 1105024 HOME-START STAFFORD AND DISTRICT
- 11 June 2019: Funds received from 1099467 STAFFORD FURNITURE EXCHANGE
- 23 March 2023: Funds received from 1055284 THE CANNOCK CHASE CHURCHES HOUSING COALITION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Rowcliffe | Chair | 13 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Tracy Ann Lorraine Redpath | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janis Mary Lomas | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rizwana Yousaf | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Howard | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trish Rowlands | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Katherine Horne | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CAROL SHIRT | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA KAREN MORREY | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £711.46k | £1.20m | £1.43m | £1.47m | £1.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £809.63k | £1.03m | £1.30m | £1.38m | £1.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £317.56k | £299.72k | |
|
Income from government grants | £240.33k | £547.55k | £787.27k | £554.02k | £688.07k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £51.85k | £63.70k | £79.47k | £65.56k | £82.04k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £657.81k | £1.14m | £1.34m | £1.40m | £1.54m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.59k | £755 | £1.12k | £2.30k | £5.51k | |
|
Income - Other | £200 | £400 | £650 | £7.04k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £790.53k | £1.02m | £1.28m | £1.36m | £1.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.10k | £12.99k | £16.36k | £16.76k | £7.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.45k | £3.05k | £3.60k | £4.28k | £4.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.68k | £7.24k | £10.42k | £8.57k | £8.66k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £325.26k | £535.35k | £766.12k | £786.86k | £839.68k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £65.34k | £105.64k | £213.19k | £140.84k | £146.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jan 2014
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND INCREASE THE SAFETY OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND ABUSE, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION AND ANY OTHER SERVICES OR ACTIVITIES WHICH MAY RELIEVE THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES, AND WHERE REQUIRED, WE WILL SUPPORT MEN IN THE SAME SITUATION. 2) TO RELIEVE ANY WOMAN OR CHILD IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO MAY BE TEMPORARILY HOMELESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES AND BY THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL RELIEVE THEIR NEED. 3) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND THE PREVENTION THEREOF AND TO UNDERTAKE OR CONTRIBUTE TO RESEARCH INTO SUCH MATTERS AND/OR PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stafford Womens Aid
PO Box 2387
Stafford
ST16 3WS
- Phone:
- 0300 330 5959
- Website:
-
staffordshirewomensaid.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window