THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION DERBYSHIRE

Charity number: 504343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Programme and activities offered to all it's voluntary members incorporating the five key features that provide the basis of effective guiding - those being 1) working together in small groups 2) decision making as individuals & groups 3) a girl led balanced and varied programme 4) care for the individual member and their fulfilment 5) a shared commitment to a common standard.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £138,728
Total expenditure: £216,850

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GIRLGUIDING DERBYSHIRE (Working name)
  • DERBYSHIRE COUNTY OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Arter Chair 25 April 2020
EREWASH AREA GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Tina Railton Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Lucinda Allen Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Beverley Myszka Trustee 01 September 2023
EREWASH AREA GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Sally Parmar Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rachel Bridge Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Claire Orford Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Fiona Caldecott Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Carole Angela Sara Nightingale Trustee 01 August 2021
ENID HOWSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
GIRLGUIDING - DERBYSHIRE NORTH EAST AREA
Received: On time
Amanda Patchett Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £365.51k £258.88k £166.16k £184.66k £138.73k
Total expenditure £356.43k £301.59k £358.95k £146.85k £216.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £68.69k £103.40k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Suite 3C
Unicorn House
Wellington Street
RIPLEY
Derbyshi
Phone:
07368233324