Financial history IN - VISIBLE

Charity Number: 1155656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £13.53k £4.97k £22.81k £25.00k £1.70k
Total expenditure £27.12k £22.70k £22.79k £24.90k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A