OUR SAVIOUR'S ASSEMBLY OF NATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise weekly services and other gatherings for members and non-members, to raise awareness and understanding of the Christian faith through the teachings of the bible, present and promote the teachings of the Bible and provide opportunities for Christian response, including but not limited to prayer and worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 August 2014: Standard registration
- ARK OF JESUS MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL UK (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHINWE WABARA | Chair | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RITA NWANI | Trustee | 05 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDA EJIMOFOR | Trustee | 05 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.24k | £4.29k | £2.28k | £1.83k | £3.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.07k | £5.02k | £2.09k | £3.05k | £5.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 January 2025 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2023 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/08/2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE AND TEACHINGS OF OUR SUPREME LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 CECIL ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 3BL
- Phone:
- 07378424752
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window