PONTEFRACT FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention and relief of poverty in Pontefract and surrounding area particularly but not exclusively by providing emergency food and supplies to individuals and families in need and signposting people to appropriate agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,358 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 29 January 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Clarida | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Byrne | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Foy | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Lee | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Devlin | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Harris | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.86k | £20.23k | £20.67k | £17.21k | £32.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.43k | £3.94k | £14.01k | £7.69k | £11.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | £7.00k | £3.00k | £1.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jan 2014 as amended on 31 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PONTEFRACT AND SURROUNDING AREA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED, AND SIGNPOSTING PEOPLE TO APPROPRIATE AGENCIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CENTRAL METHODIST CHURCH
NEWGATE
PONTEFRACT
WF8 1NB
- Phone:
- 07935530583
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window