Financial history BILSTON TOWN COMMUNITY FOOTBALL CLUB LTD

Charity number: 1155508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £53.78k £64.99k £72.44k £58.49k £72.24k
Total expenditure £49.76k £40.18k £78.42k £67.99k £81.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.11k £19.30k £3.17k N/A £250