THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Church of England parish within the South Cambridge Deanery of the Diocese of Ely.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 24 December 2013: Previously excepted registration
- CAMBRIDGE ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST CHERRY HINTON CAMBRIDGE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES DOUGLAS GEOFFREY SHAKESPEARE | Chair | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Miles Baillie | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Pott | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Joy Radice | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Frederick Hillier | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Gardiner | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Kate Segaren | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donald Keith Simpson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir Robert Brian Heap CBE | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Hilary Roxana Pennington | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Sian Watkins | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Nicholas Saunders | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair James Wilkinson | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CLARE TRENCHARD | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER GUNNING LILLEY | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £433.36k | £127.63k | £139.53k | £181.00k | £168.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £541.20k | £135.20k | £121.13k | £129.24k | £136.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £100.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957 as amended on 12 May 2022
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. John The Evangelist
Hills Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 8RN
- Phone:
- 01223572675
- Email:
- stjecambridge@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window