STOCKPORT WHEELCHAIR RACING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide opportunities and facilities for disabled persons to participate in the sport of wheelchair racing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Stockport
Governance
- 30 May 2014: Standard registration
- 16 May 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.26k | £7.43k | £1.79k | £6.63k | £6.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.88k | £7.05k | £6.40k | £6.33k | £759 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SPORT OF WHEELCHAIR RACING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window