Financial history HOWICK TRUSTEES LIMITED

Charity number: 504347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £650.20k £696.53k £818.96k £785.53k £853.72k
Total expenditure £969.06k £740.90k £929.61k £1.01m £1.00m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £28.43k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £32.25k £121.20k £66.18k £71.24k £172.02k
Income - Other trading activities £368.74k £0 £392.68k £313.22k £0
Income - Charitable activities £179.85k £154.85k £272.80k £243.04k £607.80k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £69.35k £63.70k £65.20k £73.05k £66.26k
Income - Other £0 £356.79k £22.10k £84.98k £7.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £717.79k £442.03k £929.61k £1.01m £1.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £251.28k £298.87k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.93k £14.10k £110.27k £75.65k £74.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £251.28k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0