THE NORFOLK & NORWICH - EL VIEJO FRIENDSHIP LINK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding the provision of educational equipment for primary pupils from impoverished families to enable them to attend school in the municipality of El Viejo in Nicaragua,through teachers committees and a local paid worker. Currently 200 such "scholarships" are awarded. Occasional requests from schools are considered and may be all or part funded,, e.g. a laptop, new classroom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
- Nicaragua
Governance
- 24 April 2014: Standard registration
- 24 May 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 24 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1106881 NICARAGUA SOLIDARITY CAMPAIGN LIMITED
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.74k | £3.06k | £2.57k | £2.84k | £2.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £4.21k | £5.05k | £2.32k | £9.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEP 2010 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE LINK’S OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO CHILDREN FROM POOR FAMILIES IN EL VIEJO AND BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF THE NEEDS OF NICARAGUA AND ITS PEOPLES AND IN PARTICULAR THE NEEDS OF EL VIEJO AND ITS PEOPLES. (2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN EL VIEJO, NICARAGUA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PROJECTS RELATING TO IMPROVING WATER SUPPLY, DRAINAGE AND HOUSING, AND THE SUPPORT FOR GENERAL HEALTH PROVISION, HEALTH EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO LOCAL HEALTH ISSUES. (3) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN EL VIEJO, NICARAGUA, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window