Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALLINGTON, ST NICHOLAS WITH MAIDSTONE, ST PETER, MAIDSTONE
Charity number: 1155127

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Claudette Red Gayle | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Jackie Wilkinson | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Stone | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FROUDE | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Lincoln | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rogers | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Bagshaw | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Tulip | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martina Tidball | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Redford | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bernard Smetham | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Brind | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Gillian Waite | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Higgs | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER CAROL STONE | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN SALVAGE | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.