GLOBAL HUMANITARIAN RELIEF FOUNDATION (GHRF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PREVENTION OF RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, HEALTH AND WELFARE. PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, SUPPORT TO THOSE IN NEED ANYWHERE AROUND THE WORLD INCLUDING WATER SANITATION, AND HOUSING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Greece
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Tanzania
- Turkey
Governance
- 19 August 2014: CIO registration
- GHRF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUHELA HAQQ | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD MAHBOOB ALI KHAN | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Afsha Mohamed | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahsan Sattar | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED HANIF ISMAIL | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.64k | £193.16k | £190.50k | £212.30k | £302.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.02k | £197.49k | £184.40k | £194.87k | £321.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Aug 2014 as amended on 24 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
1.1 FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN SUCH A WAY AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT INCLUDING BY THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE AND ASSISTANCE OF SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS. 1.2 THE PREVENTION OR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS OF SERVICES TO THE INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 1.3 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 1.4 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONGST VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTERS IN THE FORM OF MONEY AND OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND /OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GHRF
24 Church Road
LONDON
SE19 2ET
- Phone:
- 07813146816
- Email:
- ghrf@email.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window