Financial history Pobl Trust

Charity number: 1161479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.58k £73.97k £80.06k £129.04k £111.53k
Total expenditure £1.34m £8.35k £70.88k £42.60k £191.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A