Financial history THE BRITISH SUNDIAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1155688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.44k £12.99k £24.91k £24.28k £22.15k
Total expenditure £13.92k £14.14k £27.83k £29.68k £20.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A