NATIONAL COMMUNITY LAND TRUST NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National CLT Network supports and promotes the work of Community Land Trusts (CLTs) in England and Wales. CLTs are local organisations set up and run by volunteers to develop and manage homes as well as other assets. We campaign for a more supportive policy and funding environment for CLTs; raise awareness of CLTs; support CLTs and provide access to expert support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 May 2014: CIO registration
- COMMUNITY LAND TRUST NETWORK (Working name)
- NATIONAL CLT NETWORK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Ian Duncan | Chair | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE GEORGINA HART | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Knight | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Bassey-Williams MBE | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kym Shaen-Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise White | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAUDE COLIN GLEN | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Boys Smith | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82m | £513.91k | £4.36m | £338.48k | £366.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.51m | £724.74k | £4.40m | £345.69k | £365.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00m | N/A | £4.01m | N/A | £10.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £4.25m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £17.52k | £13.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.82m | £496.39k | £100.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £340 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.51m | £724.74k | £4.40m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £10.30k | £7.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £63.24k | £3.63m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION, TRAINING, ASSISTANCE WITH FUNDING AND OTHER SERVICES OR SUPPORT THAT ENHANCE THE QUALITY AND WORK OF COMMUNITY LAND TRUSTS (OR PROSPECTIVE COMMUNITY LAND TRUSTS) WHICH ARE (OR WILL BE) (I) ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; AND/OR (II) VOLUNTARY BODIES (AS DEFINED BELOW), AND IN PARTICULAR TO: 3.1.1 RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, HOSTELS OR OTHER ACCOMMODATION THROUGH COMMUNITY LAND TRUSTS; 3.1.2 ADVANCE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND THE CREATION OF EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY SUPPORTING COMMUNITY LAND TRUSTS WHICH PROVIDE WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.1.3 PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF COMMUNITY LAND TRUSTS WHICH UNDERTAKE THIS WORK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 3.1.4 ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF LOCAL COMMUNITIES BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF COMMUNITY LAND TRUSTS WHO MAKE SUCH FACILITIES AVAILABLE; 3.1.5 ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF COMMUNITY LAND TRUSTS WHICH PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT OPEN GREEN SPACES; AND 3.2 SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY BE FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINED BY THE CHARITY TRUSTEES. "VOLUNTARY BODY" MEANS AN INDEPENDENT ORGANISATION WHICH IS FORMALLY CONSTITUTED, INDEPENDENT OF CENTRAL AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT AND ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, WHICH IS NOT PERMITTED BY ITS CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION AND WHICH BENEFITS FROM VOLUNTARISM. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT A VOLUNTARY BODY MAY NOT BE PARTY POLITICAL. "VOLUNTARY BODIES" SHALL BE INTERPRETED ACCORDINGLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34-35 Butcher Row
SHREWSBURY
Shropshire
SY1 1UW
- Phone:
- 02030967790
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window