Trustees THE DAVID PARR HOUSE

Charity number: 1156298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Wimhurst Chair 24 March 2020
None on record
Katherine Mary Drake Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Christina Helen McGregor Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Miller Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Michael Muller Trustee 09 March 2014
None on record