RIDE 2 ACHIEVE RDA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide disabled riders reach their maximum potential by provision of bespoke support to their specific needs and ambitions. Each rider has an individual plan that will set challenging goals for them to meet this ambition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 20 February 2014: Standard registration
- 01 March 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 01 March 2024: Funds transferred to 244108 RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING ...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.03k | £34.31k | £26.58k | £17.43k | £9.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.36k | £34.42k | £29.49k | £17.20k | £12.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 January 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 August 2022 | 333 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 02 April 2022 | 549 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2019
(These accounts |
02 April 2022 | 549 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL-BEING IN THE WORCESTERSHIRE AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window