Accounts and annual returns SEEQ

Charity number: 1156395
Charity reporting is overdue by 1037 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1037 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1037 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 June 2022 348 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 June 2022 348 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 December 2020 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 December 2020 180 days late Download Open in new window