NORTHFIELD COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
delivers a vital range of services from a community hub in a high street location, working with over 10,000 people per year. These services contribute to the overall well being of the local community current service delivery includes , job support , volunteering opportunities , drug and alcohol services, sexual health services , uk online centre, job and employment support, quit smoking
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,694,542
Donations and legacies | £817.78k | |
Charitable activities | £807.94k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £68.82k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,328,162
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £150,000 from 6 government contract(s) and £1,544,542 from 13 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.33m | |
Retained for future use | £366.38k |
People

25 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 03 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carmel Corrigan | Chair | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Dempsey | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chantell Marler | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Sutton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hill | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Wood | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CLARKE | Trustee | 25 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.53k | £683.35k | £954.67k | £1.02m | £1.69m | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.29k | £605.94k | £874.97k | £1.14m | £1.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £48.75k | N/A | £22.00k | £715.41k | £150.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £683.35k | £200.02k | £162.25k | £1.54m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | £474.73k | £463.37k | £817.78k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £65.44k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £683.35k | £420.02k | £492.57k | £807.94k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £68.82k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £38.22k | £59.93k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £463.37k | £2.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £605.94k | £866.77k | £1.14m | £1.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £8.05k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £42.98k | £42.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £90.35k | £42.70k | £66.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £159 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £2.17k | £11.08k | £13.01k | £12.51k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £192.80k | £252.80k | £330.74k | £741.85k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £18.78k | £10.36k | £47.05k | £91.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/04/2014
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; (E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; (G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (H) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (J) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (K) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; (L) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; (M) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 FAIRMEAD RISE
KINGS NORTON
BIRMINGHAM
B38 8BS
- Phone:
- 01214112157
- Email:
- info@northfieldcommunity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window