Financial history WOODBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1155239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £29.07k £34.36k £27.76k £31.77k £37.85k
Total expenditure £27.50k £34.34k £21.69k £51.58k £38.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.35k £17.60k £2.67k £20.40k N/A