WOODBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of the village hall for use by all members of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 08 January 2014: Standard registration
- 03 May 2016: Funds received from 282254 WOODBURY VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Jane Price | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Whitton | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Thornton | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Jackson | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID JOHN BOWERS | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs Chris Quantick | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Mr ROBIN LENNOX | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Patrick Browne | Trustee | 20 September 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.07k | £34.36k | £27.76k | £31.77k | £37.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.50k | £34.34k | £21.69k | £51.58k | £38.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.35k | £17.60k | £2.67k | £20.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 NOV 2013
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTSOF WOODBURY, DEVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 ESCOT COTTAGES
BROADWAY
WOODBURY
EXETER
EX5 1NT
- Phone:
- 01395232805
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window