FISHING FOR LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have provided support and instruction to all members who have, or have had breast, cancer by teaching them fly fishing to promote healing post operations. We now have groups in, Somerset, Devon, Cornwall, Avon, Pennines, Dorset and Gloucestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
- Lancashire
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 July 2014: CIO registration
- SWFFL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Veale | Chair | 01 April 2009 |
|
|||||
Ian Sorenson | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
SALLY PIZZI | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN PAYNE | Trustee | 01 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY SCOTT | Trustee | 01 April 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.06k | £5.07k | £6.11k | £5.48k | £3.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.43k | £1.48k | £7.88k | £3.96k | £5.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 225 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 14 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE, OR HAVE HAD, BREAST CANCER, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holworthy Farm
Brompton Regis
Dulverton
TA22 9NY
- Phone:
- 01398371244
- Email:
- holworthyfarm@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window