Financial history WILDLIFE IN NEED

Charity number: 1156201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.95k £20.00k £15.12k £25.00k £25.00k
Total expenditure £9.90k £19.95k £15.10k £24.90k £24.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A