YOUTH LEADS UK

Charity Number: 1155789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Youth Leads UK is an award-winning charity getting the voice of young people heard and acted upon. We run skills development programmes to upskill disadvantaged young people, publish Youth Leads Magazine providing a platform for young people to use their voice and we challenge decision-makers on under-representation of young people at leadership level.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £378,998
Total expenditure: £345,057

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • XPLODE MAGAZINE (Working name)
  • YOUTH LEADS (Working name)
  • XPLODE MAGAZINE BOLTON (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADAM TOORAWA Chair 14 March 2025
None on record
Hannah Lawless Trustee 09 November 2024
None on record
Rosaleen Tite Ahern Trustee 16 September 2023
None on record
Chloe Maria Bennett Trustee 02 September 2019
None on record
Lydia German Trustee 26 January 2018
None on record
KHALIL MALJI Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £125.34k £231.01k £195.71k £246.73k £379.00k
Total expenditure £130.80k £163.72k £232.07k £261.02k £345.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.25k £32.00k £20.20k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Youth Leads UK
Blue
Media City Uk
SALFORD
M50 2ST
Phone:
03301200619
Website:

youthleads.uk