SOCIAL SQUARE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping disadvantaged families and the provision of facilities for recreation and leisure for those in need of such.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 27 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIREL HOPSTEIN | Chair | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MORDECHAI FRIESEL | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN BREUER | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RESI NEUSTADT | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.87k | £65.51k | £83.82k | £64.91k | £88.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.09k | £45.09k | £83.31k | £65.38k | £78.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 AUG 2013
Charitable objects
I. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. II. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. III. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH PROVISION BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. IV. THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD SUCH AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THEY ARE REGARDED AS CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 6
DOMINION HOUSE
91 DUNSMURE ROAD
LONDON
N16 5HT
- Phone:
- 02088096519
- Email:
- info@socialsquareuk.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window