THE FELIX DEXTER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No activities have been undertaken as yet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
- St Kitts And Nevis
Governance
- 20 January 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF SCHUMANN BA MA | Chair | 14 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Runilla Chilton | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Pauline Wilson | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Whitehouse | Trustee | 14 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £0 | £324 | £0 | £5.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £380 | £1.52k | £685 | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Jan 2014
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN ST KITTS AND THE WEST INDIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. (2) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CANCER AND SICKLE CELL DISEASE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (3) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Equi Vision Services Ltd
Unit 19
Moran House
449-451 High Road
LONDON
NW10 2JJ
- Phone:
- 07985 523033
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window