Financial history THE FAYE KNOWLES-CHAPMAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.79k £1.39k £2.70k £2.82k £2.16k
Total expenditure £4.14k £812 £1.75k £3.31k £1.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A N/A N/A N/A