PECULIAR PEOPLES' PALACE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of health or saving of lives, the general public/mankind, provides services, religious activities, the prevention or relief of poverty, general charitable purposes, provides advocacy/advice/information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Mariana Islands
- Norway
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 14 April 2014: Standard registration
- PPPM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adeola Ojeniyi Founder | Chair | 18 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Olusegun John | Trustee | 05 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Olukayode Odunjo | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2018 | 30/03/2019 | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £100 | £0 | £100 | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £100 | £0 | £95 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOV 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS) IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. THE TRUSTEES SHALL USE THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 Plane Street
HULL
HU3 6BY
- Phone:
- 07411128401
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window