NOTTINGHAM HOSPITALS' CHOIR

Charity Number: 1158462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Attend rehearsals, put on workshops, perform concerts in different venues whilst raising money for children's oncology at QMC Nottingham.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,736
Total expenditure: £5,797

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 September 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NHC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY LANCASTER Chair 08 July 2016
None on record
JANE JARVIS Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Dr Jonathan Waite Trustee 07 March 2014
RUDDINGTON AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
JOANE DAVIDSON Trustee 07 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.66k £4.98k £4.80k £6.97k £6.74k
Total expenditure £7.85k £5.11k £5.52k £4.94k £5.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 August 2024 210 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
610 Wollaton Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG8 2AA
Phone:
59281931
Website:

No information available