Financial history YORK RESCUE BOAT

Charity number: 1155849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £88.59k £57.86k £101.58k £76.54k £72.04k
Total expenditure £41.89k £40.46k £81.49k £114.93k £65.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.12k
Income from government grants N/A £9.92k N/A N/A N/A