YORK RESCUE BOAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
York Rescue Boat is to provide a physical and proactive commitment to furthering the safety of the rivers in York. We aim to achieve this by means of a patrol and rescue boat, education and awareness. With progression York Rescue Boat endeavours to provide a stand-by team that will respond as an auxiliary service to the 999 services in area?s of Search & Rescue and community flood assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £8,121 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 February 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew David Hart | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Newport | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alistair McCleary | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
David Grabowski | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.59k | £57.86k | £101.58k | £76.54k | £72.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.89k | £40.46k | £81.49k | £114.93k | £65.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.12k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE YORK RESCUE BOAT IS TO SAVE LIFE. IT WILL ACHIEVE THIS THROUGH THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: (1) PROVISION OF LAND AND RIVER BASED WATER SAFETY PATROLLING WITHIN THE YORK AREA. (2) PROVISION OF FLOOD RESCUE IN YORK AND AS PART OF THE NATIONAL CONTINGENCY FRAMEWORK . (3) SUPPORT TO NORTH YORKSHIRE FIRE AND RESCUE . (4) EDUCATION TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, IN ORDER TO INCREASE AWARENESS OF THE RISKS ASSOCIATED WITH THE RIVERS. (5) FUNDRAISING AND COMMUNICATION IN ORDER TO SUPPORT THE ACTIVITIES IDENTIFIED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
York Rescue Boat
York Eco Business Center
Amy Johnson Way
York
North Yorkshire
YO30 4AG
- Phone:
- 01904777777
- Email:
- Info@yorkrescueboat.com
- Website:
-
Www.yorkrescueboat.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window