FRIENDS OF BLACKPOOL MUSIC SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support young people in Blackpool Fylde and Wyre by providing advice, assistance through music activities and bursaries to; a) Enable participation in society as independent, mature and responsible adults b) Advance education c) Provide recreational and leisure time music orientated activities for all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 March 2014: CIO registration
- FOBMS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR PAUL LESLIE BARKER PHD | Chair | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Hampson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Clare | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY LOUISE KIRKHAM | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.24k | £20.20k | £25.84k | £4.83k | £35.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.04k | £5.83k | £4.79k | £5.03k | £15.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 19 LIVING IN BLACKPOOL AND WYRE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF MUSIC, EDUCATION AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AND BY AWARDING BURSARIES AS A MEANS OF; A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LIVING IN BLACKPOOL AND WYRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKPOOL BOROUGH COUNCIL
PO BOX 4
BLACKPOOL
FY1 1NA
- Phone:
- 01253476767
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window